U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10126
  • Case Name: Katharine H Evans
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Final Report & Account]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
April, 2018
  • April 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.