U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20141
  • Case Name: Crossroads Market, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree]
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order Concerning Claims]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Written Opinion]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedules and Statements]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Sua Sponte Order]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.