U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00301
  • Case Name: MARIANO vs. RITE AID OF MAINE INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • October 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 15, 2018: [SEALED Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 23, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.