U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20151
  • Case Name: Ryan A Wyman and Heather L. Wyman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
June, 2018
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Schedules and Statements]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Entry]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.