U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20157
  • Case Name: Tempo Dulu, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Default]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appeal Transmission Form]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Exclusivity Period]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Exclusivity Period ]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Supplemental Document]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Matrix]
  • April 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Matrix]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.