U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10139
  • Case Name: Derek J Decesere
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection to Professional Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
April, 2019
  • April 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Stay ]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.