U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10137
  • Case Name: Garrett W. Davis and Meagan D. Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Approving Final Report & Account]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
July, 2018
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Redeem]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Consent]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Proposed Order]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Emergency Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Proposed Order]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Redeem]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.