U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10143
  • Case Name: Mary S Garcelon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
July, 2018
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment (Final) (Chapter 13)]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Affidavit]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment #3 (Chapter 13)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment #2 (Chapter 13)]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Installment Payment #1 (Chapter 13)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2018
  • March 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Entry]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.