U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10144
  • Case Name: Thomas Philip Bouchard and Rose Marie Bouchard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
July, 2018
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.