U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20174
  • Case Name: Robert M Elder, Jr. and Pamela J Elder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Documents]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.