U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00003
  • Case Name: MASON v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 24, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.