U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01001
  • Case Name: Social Security Administration v. Robstock, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 10, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Entry]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Consent]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • June 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.