U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10155
  • Case Name: Tina Marie St. Laurent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismissing Case]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.