U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00035
  • Case Name: KIEF v. WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [MDL Certified Transfer Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [MDL Conditional Transfer Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.