U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00143
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 17 BRIDGE ST LEWISTON MAINE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 03, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.