U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20179
  • Case Name: Charles Pappas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Witness List]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sanctions]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compel]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compel]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compel]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Motion]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.