U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10159
  • Case Name: Marcia Gammon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Consent]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.