U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10163
  • Case Name: Daniel A Pinnette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Vacating Order]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Generic Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Generic Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Installment Payment #3 (Chapter 07)]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Installment Payment #2 (Chapter 07)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Entry]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Installment Payment #1 (Chapter 07)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Installment Payment #1 (Chapter 07)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Social Security Number]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Social Security Number]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.