U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10164
  • Case Name: Janice E. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.