U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20185
  • Case Name: Gabriel Richard Coulon, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Financial Management Course]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Vacating Discharge]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.