U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00151
  • Case Name: GATES v. MAINE MIDCOAST COMMUNITY ACTION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order for Service]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.