U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01002
  • Case Name: Nachurs Alpine Solutions, LLC v. McPherson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation and Order]
January, 2019
  • January 20, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Document]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Set]
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • November 11, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Compel]
  • November 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Compel]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • June 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.