U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00056
  • Case Name: MURRAY v. NEW DHC INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Confidentiality Order]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.