U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20192
  • Case Name: David Bradley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow Claims]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.