U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10175
  • Case Name: Donna S. Whalen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • May 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Withdraw Document]
March, 2019
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Brief]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Brief]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.