U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20194
  • Case Name: Ira Robert Andrews
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Compensation]
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
July, 2018
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Supplemental Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.