U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20196
  • Case Name: Deborah Marie Fanning
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismissing Case]
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.