U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00158
  • Case Name: KULIS et al v. WINN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Bench Trial]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
March, 2019
  • March 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.