U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10185
  • Case Name: Clarence Albert Stevens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Order]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order on Document]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.