U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00335
  • Case Name: APON v. ABF FREIGHT SYSTEMS INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • November 13, 2018: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.