U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20206
  • Case Name: David A. Munster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
April, 2018
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Entry]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.