U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00164
  • Case Name: CAUDILL v. KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Bill of Costs]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.