U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00163
  • Case Name: DIGIACOMO v. KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Objection]
  • July 25, 2019: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.