U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00156
  • Case Name: MONGA et al v. NATIONAL ENDOWMENT FOR THE ARTS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 21, 2018: [Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.