U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10196
  • Case Name: Central Maine Meats, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Compensation]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Objection]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Employ]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Compensation]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Change of Address]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Converting Case from Chapter 12 to Chapter 7]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 12 to 07]
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assume/Reject]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assume/Reject]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Limit Notice]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Shorten Time]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Generic Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.