U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00501
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GUERRETTE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment of Foreclosure]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.