U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00054
  • Case Name: JOHNSON v. MOLINA INFORMATION SYSTEMS LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order of Recusal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.