U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20223
  • Case Name: Florence Lorraine Gould
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order Vacating Order Waiving Filing Fee]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule H]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule G]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order of Ineffective Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order of Ineffective Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.