U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10209
  • Case Name: Cynthia M. McCarthy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
April, 2018
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order to Comply]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.