U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00166
  • Case Name: DASTINOT v. AUBURN POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order for Service]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.