U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10210
  • Case Name: Victoria Lynn Porter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Generic Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Generic Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Request for Change of Address]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment (Form 101B)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Schedules and Statements]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
April, 2018
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order to Comply]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.