U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10217
  • Case Name: Jennifer Ann Boudreau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Document]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.