U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10218
  • Case Name: Patricia Marie Ferguson and Kurt David Ferguson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compromise Controversy]
April, 2019
  • April 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compromise Controversy]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule J]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule I]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.