U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10220
  • Case Name: Zenon J Boutot, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Installment Payment (Final) (Chapter 07)]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Installment Payment #3 (Chapter 07)]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Installment Payment #2 (Chapter 07)]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Installment Payment #1 (Chapter 07)]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.