U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20239
  • Case Name: David P. Tucci, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.