U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20240
  • Case Name: Lauri A. Preo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Discharging Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Financial Management Course]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Filing Fee Payment]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.