U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20241
  • Case Name: David M. Munson and Anne M. Munson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.