U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10226
  • Case Name: Richard Clark Burgess and Faith Anne Burgess
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Statement of Intent]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order to Comply]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.