U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10229
  • Case Name: Shanelle Lee Nickerson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.