U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20245
  • Case Name: Charles Scott Mollica, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismiss Case]
  • July 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismissing Case]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule J]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule I]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule H]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule G]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule D]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule C]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Consent]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Waiver of Credit Counseling]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.